judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOBATO (GREG) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33386
Short Caption:LOBATO (GREG) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR2987Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00153
11/23/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Motion to Change Venue--8/11/98. Court Reporter: Cecily Krawczyk. 98-00154
12/07/1998AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 98-00288
01/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Fast track statement or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned due: 10 days. 99-00153
01/25/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (mailed on: 01/20/99). 99-00503
02/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (mailed on 02/08/99). 99-00897
02/09/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. (mailed on: 02/08/99). 99-00898
04/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's counsel shall file with this court a certified copy of the transcript of the hearing held in juvenile court regarding certification of appellant as an adult within 15 days from the date of this order. 99-03358
08/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why the certification issues should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant's counsel shall file a certified copy of the transcript of the certification hearing within 10 days or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 99-07494
09/08/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Brief in Response to this Court's Order of August 13. 99-08456
08/18/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-14515
09/13/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14701
09/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 15, 2000. 00-14701