judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK M. MEEHAN v. THE CITY OF SHERIDAN

Case Heading (S-07-0229)
Case Number:S-07-0229Case Docketed On:10/01/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:PATRICK M. MEEHAN v. THE CITY OF SHERIDAN
Full Title:PATRICK M. MEEHAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE CITY OF SHERIDAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick M. MeehanJames P. Castberg
AppelleeCity of SheridanMia Mikesell Shifrar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/01/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/01/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/01/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/09/2007Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - other to file petition for writ of reviewMotionExtension of time - otherFinal
11/06/2007Order - Other. Order on motion for additional time to file petition for writ of review. (Court converted case to a petition for review and then denied petition)OrderOtherFinal
11/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Deficient pleadingsNotice-OutgoingDeficient pleadingsFinal