judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00308-CR
04-82-00308-CR
07/23/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Donel, Edward M.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/02/1983Mandate Issued
08/02/1983Mandate Issued
06/10/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/10/1983Submission
05/10/1983Submission
05/10/1983Submitted
08/19/1982Case ready to be set
08/19/1982Brief Filed
08/19/1982Case ready to be set
08/11/1982Party waives argument
07/26/1982Brief Filed
06/28/1982Record Filed
06/28/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/25/1982Record Approved
07/23/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-CR-0736B
12 Years