judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00072-CV
04-82-00072-CV
02/12/1982
Contract
Woodham Corporation
Traweek Exploration Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1984Mandate Issued
11/13/1984Mandate Issued
10/29/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
09/26/1984Opinion issuedReversed
09/26/1984Opinion issuedReversed
06/18/1982Submission
06/18/1982Case ready to be set
06/18/1982Brief Filed
06/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/18/1982Case ready to be set
06/18/1982Submission
06/18/1982Submitted
06/15/1982Requests Oral Argument
06/11/1982Motion to Advance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/1982Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/24/1982Response to Motion Filed
05/13/1982Motion to Strike Filed
05/03/1982Brief Filed
04/27/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/1982Motion to Advance Filed
04/19/1982Response to Motion Filed
04/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/23/1982Brief Filed
03/23/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
03/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/24/1982Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1982Exhibits Filed
02/18/1982Motion to Supplement Record Filed
02/12/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1982No Description Available.
02/12/1982Record Filed
02/12/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/04/1982Appeal Bond Filed
01/15/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
293rd Judicial District Court
Zavala
Honorable Benjamin A Martinez
6372