judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00020-CR
09-82-00020-CR
02/12/1982
Other Felony
Jackson, Warren Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/1983Mandate Issued
11/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/22/1982Brief Filed
02/16/1982Brief Filed
02/12/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack R. King
30928
16 Years