judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00082-CR
04-82-00082-CR
02/12/1982
Marijuana Possession
Terrell, Sammy Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
06/20/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ No Action Taken
10/05/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/17/1982Brief Filed
09/17/1982Case ready to be set
08/18/1982Waives Oral Argument
08/16/1982Brief Filed
07/21/1982Record Filed
07/20/1982Record Approved
04/21/1982No Description Available.
04/07/1982No Description Available.
02/18/1982Notice of appeal received
02/12/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
02/12/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/20/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
198th Judicial District Court
Kerr
675
5 Years