judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00016-CV
09-82-00016-CV
02/17/1982
Contract
Salter, John L. et ux
O. Dean Couch, Jr. d/b/a Couch Mortgage Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/1982Case stored
08/13/1982Mandate Issued
06/24/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/02/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
02/17/1982No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable John C Martin
9445