judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DIANA P. NOWEZKI V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-1125
Short Caption:DIANA P. NOWEZKI V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00513-10Filed Date:09/09/2010

Opening Event Date:09/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/27/2013
Argued/Submitted:04/15/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/07/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDiana P. NowezkiNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Tonya A. SappNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/09/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
09/09/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/09/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
09/15/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
05/05/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 6/4/10
05/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/29/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF & appendix
06/30/2011RECEIVED - petitioner's brief & appendix
07/12/2011FiledOrder Granting PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF & appendix
07/12/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
07/12/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
08/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 3, 2011 Brief (Respondent)Granted
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 3, 2011 Brief (Respondent)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 22, 2011 (Respondent)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until November 22, 2011 (Respondent
11/21/2011FiledMotion to hold appeal in abeyance (Respondent) construed as a motion for an extension of timeGranted
12/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion to hold appeal in abeyance (Respondent) construed as a motion for an extension of time - 12/30/11
12/21/2011FiledMotion to hold appeal in abeyance (Respondent)Granted
01/03/2012VacatedOrder Granting Motion To Stay Appeal
03/02/2012FiledStatement regarding Case Status. (Respondent)
05/07/2012FiledStatement regarding case status (Respondent)
07/11/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent)Granted
07/20/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent)
07/20/2012FiledStatus Statement (Respondent)
09/12/2012FiledStatement regarding report on case status (Respondent)
11/19/2012FiledStatement regarding on case status (Respondent)
01/18/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent)Granted
01/25/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Statement/Status Report (Respondent)
01/25/2013FiledStatement regarding report on case status (Respondent)
03/26/2013FiledMotion for leave to file case status report (Respondent)Granted
04/03/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for leave to file case status report (Respondent)
04/03/2013FiledStatus Report regarding pending (Respondent)
05/24/2013FiledStatement regarding case status report (Respondent)
08/23/2013FiledOrder - directing motion & status statement
10/08/2013FiledOrder directing motion & status statement
10/25/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File to file out of time the report on case status Other (Respondent)Granted
11/26/2013FiledStatement regarding report on case status (Respondent)
11/26/2013FiledOrder - directing brief (Respondent)
11/26/2013FiledProceed With Appeal; No Longer On Hold/Stayed
12/27/2013FiledBriefing Completed
12/27/2013FiledMemorandum/Statement In Lieu Of Brief (Respondent)
02/11/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
02/27/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/15/2014FiledSubmitted To Assoicate Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Assoicate Judge Beckwith, and Senior Judge Steadman.(Dianna P. Nowezki, Pro Se)
07/16/2014FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges; and Steadman, Senior Judge)
08/07/2014FiledMandate