judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33404
Short Caption:TAYLOR (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C72389Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00194
01/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 99-00097
01/29/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Dayvid J. Figler. He is not and has never been attorney of record in this matter. 99-00648
02/26/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Based on our preliminary review of this appeal, it appeared that appellant was represented by Dayvid Figler during the lower court proceedings. Figler informed this court that he did not actually represent appellant below. Figler is relieved of any further obligation in connection with this appeal.] fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-01344
03/24/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-02115
03/24/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/14/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 31, 1999. 99-02115