judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID LABON BUSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0247)
Case Number:S-07-0247Case Docketed On:10/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAVID LABON BUSH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID LABON BUSH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Labon BushDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 108
Citation:193 P.3d 203 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/28/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata - brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
01/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Errata - brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, nine volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; Volumes V-VIII, transcripts; Volume IX, confidental folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant; and Jenny Lynn Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; JennyLynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/17/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Two boxes signed for 10/6/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/29/2008Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court petition for writ of certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari DeniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal