judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-2828
A-2828
07/28/1950
Application for Writ of Error
GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE, ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/21/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/30/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/09/1951Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/25/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/07/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/20/1951Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
05/21/1951Motion for Rehearing
05/09/1951Opinion issued
03/30/1951Supplemental Brief filed
02/21/1951Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1951Response to Motion filed
02/09/1951Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
10/25/1950Motion for RehearingFiling granted
08/07/1950Response to Petition
07/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Guy A. Thompson, Trustee, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information