Case: 14-89-00039-CV
14-89-00039-CV
01/12/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Kling, Stewart M.
Ruffino, Carolyn L., Judge, 361st District Court, Brazos
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
02/06/1989 | Case stored | | |
02/02/1989 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
02/02/1989 | Opinion issued | DENIED | |
01/20/1989 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RES | DENIED | |
01/17/1989 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
01/17/1989 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
01/12/1989 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
01/12/1989 | Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES | | |
01/12/1989 | Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL | | |
01/12/1989 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
01/12/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Hon. William C. Lipsey |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Relator | C. J. Kling |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Respondent | Judge, 361st District Court |
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable CAROLYN L. RUFFINO
31,529-361