judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00025-CR
09-82-00025-CR
02/16/1982
Burglary
Howard, Mervin Clifford
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/29/1983Case stored
03/29/1983Mandate Issued
02/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/24/1982Brief Filed
08/09/1982Brief Filed
02/16/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
33934
45 years TDC