Case: C-7387
C-7387
04/18/1988
See former TRAP 130(D)
TEXAS COOKIE COMPANY JOEL WAHLBERG & SHIRLEY VENABLE
HENDRICKS & PERALTA INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/18/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | SEE EVENT # 3 | |
05/17/1988 | Reply to Response | Respondent | REPLY PLACED IN 130(D) BIN | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/07/1988 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | NO REHEARING FILED | | |
06/15/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
05/25/1988 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
05/25/1988 | No description available. | | | |
05/18/1988 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | SEE EVENT # 3 | | |
05/17/1988 | Reply to Response | REPLY PLACED IN 130(D) BIN | | |
04/18/1988 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | | |
04/18/1988 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/07/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-86-00516-CV
Reformed & Affirmed
747 Sw2d 873, 02-18-88
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable NOAH KENNEDY
Trial Court Information
94th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Rene Haas
84-4504-C