judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN M. FENTY V. CLINTON LESUEUR

Case Information: 10-DA-0016
Short Caption:ADRIAN M. FENTY V. CLINTON LESUEURClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-1430-10Filed Date:09/09/2010

Opening Event Date:09/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAdrian M. Fenty N
Bruce J. Klores NN
RespondentClinton Lesueur NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/09/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL
09/09/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/14/2010 ORDERED that applicant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a non-final order of the Superior Court. See DC Code 11-21 (2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA is HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
09/14/2010TMC - OTSC - petitioner's motion to file (LODGED) response - oppo
10/07/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file response to order to show cause.
10/07/2010RECEIVED - pet's response to show cause order
10/14/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION to Petitioner's Motion to Late File Memo in Response to Order of September 14, 2010.
10/26/2010 ORDERED that APPLICANT'S MOTION TO LATE FILE IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE THE LODGED RESPONSE. It is *****MORE*****
10/26/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
10/26/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER as the trial court remanded the case to the Magistrate Judge for further findings on the immunity issue. (RDWATE) (jl)
10/26/2010DISMISSED