judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHEN R. WINSHIP v. GEM CITY BONE & JOINT, P.C.

Case Heading (S-07-0246)
Case Number:S-07-0246Case Docketed On:10/25/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:STEPHEN R. WINSHIP v. GEM CITY BONE & JOINT, P.C.
Full Title:STEPHEN R. WINSHIP, Appellant (Defendant), v. GEM CITY BONE & JOINT, P.C., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen R. WinshipMark W. Gifford
AppelleeGem City Bone & Joint, P.C.Steve C.M. Aron

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 68
Citation:185 P.3d 1252 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/07/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/16/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/24/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/31/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/06/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/11/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/9/08 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal