judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00022-CR
09-82-00022-CR
02/16/1982
Robbery
Salazar, Jr. Joseph Davis
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1983Mandate Issued
05/04/1983Petition for ReviewRefused
03/11/1983Petition for Review
02/10/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/13/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
02/16/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
39,750
30 years TDC