judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00087-CV
04-82-00087-CV
02/16/1982
Contract
Buhay, John George
Re/Max North Central
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/22/1983Mandate Issued
11/22/1983Mandate Issued
11/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
10/19/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
07/20/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/20/1983Writ of Error filed
06/20/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/09/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/31/1983No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
03/16/1983Submission
03/16/1983Submitted
03/09/1983Case ready to be set
03/09/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
03/09/1983Supplemental Brief Received
03/09/1983Case ready to be set
01/16/1983Submission
05/12/1982Requests Oral Argument
05/11/1982Requests Oral Argument
05/10/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/1982No Description Available.
04/26/1982Brief Filed
04/07/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
04/01/1982Brief Filed
03/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/16/1982Record Filed
02/16/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/15/1982Appeal Bond Filed
12/18/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
37th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-CI-12274