judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00033-CV
08-82-00033-CV
02/16/1982
Contract
Roberts, Don, et ux., Billie Roberts
E. E. Harvey
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
04/09/1984No description available.
03/26/1984No description available.
02/22/1984No description available.
02/22/1984No description available.
02/15/1984No description available.
01/24/1984Mandate Issued
01/23/1984No description available.
12/19/1983No description available.
11/23/1983No description available.
11/23/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/29/1982Submitted
10/06/1982Submission
08/23/1982Brief Filed
08/18/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/30/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/11/1982Brief Filed
05/26/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/19/1982Supplemental Transcript Filed
04/12/1982Statement of Facts Filed
04/12/1982Transcript Filed
03/03/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
02/16/1982Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
B-46,867