judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00079-CV
04-82-00079-CV
02/16/1982
Divorce
Werner, Helen
Werner, H. C.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/23/1982Mandate Issued
11/23/1982Mandate Issued
10/04/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/23/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/20/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/26/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
07/07/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/17/1982Exhibits FiledMotion or Writ Granted
06/17/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
05/28/1982No Description Available.
05/28/1982Exhibits Filed
05/28/1982No Description Available.
05/10/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1982No Description Available.
03/24/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/16/1982No Description Available.
02/16/1982No Description Available.
02/16/1982No Description Available.
02/16/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/08/1982Appeal Bond Filed
12/16/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/23/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable B. B. Schraub
80-1041