judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-82-00040-CR
07-82-00040-CR
02/17/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Clark, Cliff John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/1984Mandate Issued
06/22/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
06/22/1984Submitted
06/21/1984Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/04/1984Order enteredPreliminary Opinion/Order
07/25/1983Do not use
07/25/1983Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
07/25/1983Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Hale
Honorable David L. Gleason
B 7232