Case: 14-93-00984-CV
14-93-00984-CV
10/28/1993
Miscellaneous civil
Elmore, Eddie Mae
Raneen, Pommier
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/31/2011 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/01/1994 | Case stored | | |
12/01/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/01/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/22/1994 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
11/07/1994 | No description available. | | |
10/06/1994 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
09/15/1994 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
09/15/1994 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/25/1994 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
08/08/1994 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
07/28/1994 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
07/28/1994 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
06/08/1994 | Submitted | | |
06/08/1994 | Submission | | |
06/08/1994 | Submitted | | |
05/10/1994 | Submission | | |
01/10/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/10/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/10/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/16/1993 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/16/1993 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/10/1993 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
12/10/1993 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/09/1993 | Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
11/23/1993 | Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE | | |
11/08/1993 | No description available. | | |
11/08/1993 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
11/08/1993 | Transcript FILED | | |
10/28/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/26/1993 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
10/26/1993 | Transcript received only; mtn. pending | | |
09/15/1993 | Bond FILED | | |
09/15/1993 | Writ of Error RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/01/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Robert B. Stanfield |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Aloysius M. Wickliff |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Carnegie H. Mims, Jr. |
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 4
Harris
Honorable WM CAMERON MCCULLOCH
189,604