judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZIEP VS. 8TH JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33396
Short Caption:ZIEP VS. 8TH JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A359599Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Schreck Morris--check no. 08198.
11/25/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and for Stay of Proceedings 98-00177
11/30/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of the party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days
12/03/1998Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of James J. Pisanelli, Esq., in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and for Stay of Proceedings. 98-00245
01/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[We grant petitioners' motion for a stay, and we stay all proceedings in district court Case No. A359599 until further order of this court]. 99-00096
01/27/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-00566
07/20/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Judgment: " . . . we grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issued a writ of mandamus." We vacate our previous order staying the proceedings in district court. NNP99A-CY/SM/ML 99-06485
07/20/1999WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to James J. Pisanelli for service upon Judge Mark R. Denton. 99-06533
07/30/1999WritFiled Writ. Writ personnally served on Judge Denton on July 23, 1999. 99-06533
07/30/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Writ of Mandamus and Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 99-06968
08/17/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-07649
08/17/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.