judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN RANDALL ERVIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0239)
Case Number:S-07-0239Case Docketed On:10/18/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN RANDALL ERVIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN RANDALL ERVIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven Randall Ervin Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 55
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/18/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/28/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/28/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/18/2008Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
01/18/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2008Motion - Other. Motion to withdraw as counsel.MotionOtherFinal
01/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Anders briefsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received, motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of time to file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2008Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
01/22/2008Service - Certificate of service - amended certificate to Anders brief indicating service on appellant.ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
01/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received amended certificate of serviceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/05/2008Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
03/10/2008Correspondence - Incoming other - received letter from appellant requesting continuance, possibly another public defender. Placed on suspense for court action.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
03/18/2008Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of appellant - no further extensions of time will be consideredOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/19/2008Correspondence - Incoming - letter to Chief Justice with appellant's version of caseCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/21/2008Opinion - Published order affirming the judgment and sentence of the district court.OpinionPublished orderFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/06/2008Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerk, three volumes.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/06/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal