judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAFORGE VS. STATE, COLLEGE SYSTEM C/W 32814

Case Information: 33397
Short Caption:LAFORGE VS. STATE, COLLEGE SYSTEM C/W 32814Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 32814 *, 33397Related Case(s): 32814
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9607819Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Berry, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/25/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Paul Gabriel Yohey--check no. 1170.
11/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00181
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Robert G. Berry. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/15/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to File Late Docketing Statment for Civil Appeal. 98-00387
12/22/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: docketing statement. New due date: the docketing statement provisionally submitted on December 15, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith. 98-00476
12/22/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00388
01/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00395
02/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of the appeal in Docket No. 33397. The settlement judge notes in his report that Docket No. 33397 is related to Docket No. 32814 and that these matters should be consolidated. We hereby consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. The briefing schedule set forth in our December 1, 1998, order in Docket No. 32814 shall constitute the briefing schedule for these consolidated matters. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-01090
03/22/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 4/21/99. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-02042
03/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Paul Yohey. Nos. 32814, 33397.
04/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Additional 30 Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (Second Request for Extension.) Nos. 32814, 33397.
04/09/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Additional Thirty Day Extension to File Opening Brief. Nos. 32814, 33397
04/15/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The unopposed motion filed April 8, 1999, is granted. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before May 21, 1999. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-02921
05/24/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant/Plaintiff's Motion for Third Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (nos. 32814 & 33397). 99-04292
05/24/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/24/99. (Case Nos. 32814 and 33397).
05/24/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (Case Nos. 32814 and 33397).
05/25/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The opening brief and appendix having been filed on May 24, 1999, the motion for an extension of time filed on May 24, 1999, is denied as moot. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-04315
06/03/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 7/26/99. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-04626
07/20/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-06543
07/23/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. The answering brief shall be served and filed on or before July 30, 1999. Nos. 32814, 33397.
07/30/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 7/30/99. (Nos. 32814 and 33397).
07/30/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. (Nos. 32814 and 33397).
08/26/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 30, 1999. (Nos. 32814 and 33397). 99-08011
09/29/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. (nos. 32814 and 33320). 99-09320
10/11/1999BriefReceived Reply Brief. (Nos. 32814 and 33397).
10/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the reply brief provisionally received on October 11, 1999. Nos. 32814, 33397. 99-09978
10/14/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Nos. 32814, 33397. Mailed on: hand delivered 10/11/99.
01/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 32814, 33397. 00-01238
01/25/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted to the Northern Nevada Panel this day. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 32814, 33397.
04/05/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Young, Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 45. Nos. 32814, 33397. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 01-04936
05/02/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (Nos. 32814 and 33397) 00-07125
05/02/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. (Nos. 32814 and 33397). 00-07125