judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LADONNA J. CAROTHERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0240)
Case Number:S-07-0240Case Docketed On:10/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LADONNA J. CAROTHERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LADONNA J. CAROTHERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLadonna J. CarothersNicholas H. Carter
Miles A. Jacoby
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 58
Citation:185 P.3d 1

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/19/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/06/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/16/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/13/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, six volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, pre-sentence investigation; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, exhibits; Volume VI, large aerial map photo.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Nicholas Carter for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/01/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Nicholas H. Carter and Miles A. Jacoby, argument by Mr. Carter for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/16/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/23/2008Record - Other - Discovered Volume VI, exhibit, in vault prior to move. Removed from poster board and sent back to Clerk in tube via certified mail.RecordOtherFinal
09/25/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Exhibit signed for 9/24/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal