judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DEARBORN STOVE COMPANY v. W. J. CAPLES

Case: A-2831
A-2831
08/01/1950
Application for Writ of Error
DEARBORN STOVE COMPANY
W. J. CAPLES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/23/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/23/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/22/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/17/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/10/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
08/01/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/1951Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
01/23/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/10/1951Opinion issued
11/23/1950Supplemental Brief filed
11/22/1950Brief on the Merits
10/17/1950Supplemental Brief filed
10/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
08/10/1950Response to Petition
08/01/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/01/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. J. CaplesRespondent
Dearborn Stove CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information