judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-91-00181-CV
01-91-00181-CV
01/01/1970
Unknown Civil Case Type.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/14/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
02/27/1991Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
02/25/1991Motion for leave to file habeas corpus proceeding
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/29/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorCheryl Elliott Thornton
StateRespondentHon. Thomas J. Terrando
Trial Court Information