judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-84-00450-CR
01-84-00450-CR
01/01/1970
Burglary
Williams, Henry McIvory
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/1986Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/21/1986No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/23/1985Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/05/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/05/1985Submitted
08/01/1985Submission
03/04/1985Brief filed
02/08/1985Brief filed
12/13/1984Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/04/1984Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/14/1984Record filed
09/27/1984Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/14/1984Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/17/1984Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
367061
10 Years TDC