Case: D-3674
D-3674
04/23/1993
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
DAVID RODRIGUEZ
THE HONORABLE ANTONIO CANTU JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/03/1993 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Respondent | to accompany reply of real parties | |
05/03/1993 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Respondent | behalf of real parties | |
04/23/1993 | Brief in Support of Petition | Relator | attached | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/06/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/06/1993 | Case Stored | No rehearing filed | | |
06/03/1993 | M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Overruled | | |
05/03/1993 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | to accompany reply of real parties | | |
05/03/1993 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | behalf of real parties | | |
04/26/1993 | Request made for reply to proceeding | FR/REAL PARTIES BY MONDAY, MAY 3 AT 5 P.M. | | |
04/23/1993 | Brief in Support of Petition | attached | | |
04/23/1993 | Exhibits received | orig & 1cc | | |
04/23/1993 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
04/23/1993 | Petition for writ received | attached | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/06/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No rehearing filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CANO, JOSEPH | Respondent | Mr. G. Thomas Coghlan |
RODRIGUEZ, DAVID | Relator | Mr. David Rodriguez |
JONES, ANY | Respondent | Mr. Les Katona Jr. |
SMITH, DAVID | Respondent | Mr. G. Thomas Coghlan |
RUIZ, MANUEL | Respondent | Mr. G. Thomas Coghlan |
LLOYDS INSURANCE COMPANY | Respondent | Mr. G. Thomas Coghlan |
UNITED INS. CO. OF AMERICA | Respondent | Mr. G. Thomas Coghlan Ms. Laura A. Cavaretta |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00172-CV
Denied
03-26-93
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
131st District Court
Bexar
Honorable Antonio G. Cantu
92-CI-12706