Case: 01-93-00351-CR
01-93-00351-CR
04/22/1993
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Ray, Elmo Jack
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/13/1998 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
04/21/1998 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
09/06/1994 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
06/21/1994 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/21/1994 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/02/1994 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
06/02/1994 | Writ disposed | Refused | |
05/27/1994 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
05/10/1994 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
04/21/1994 | Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp. | Overruled | |
04/11/1994 | Extension of time to file motion for rehearing | | |
02/17/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/17/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/18/1994 | Submitted | | |
01/18/1994 | Submission | | |
01/18/1994 | Submitted | | |
11/18/1993 | Submission | | |
10/14/1993 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/14/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/14/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/14/1993 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/29/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/16/1993 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
09/16/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/03/1993 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/20/1993 | Statement of facts filed | | |
06/03/1993 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
05/25/1993 | Transcript filed | | |
05/24/1993 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
04/22/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/20/1993 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
01/20/1993 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/06/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | David P. Weeks |
State | Criminal - Appellant | Hal R. Ridley |
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Robert Hatcher |
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Walker
Honorable WILLIAM L. MCADAMS
17,195
7 1/2 years