Case Information: 49121 | |||
Short Caption: | LESLIE (WILBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36546 , 52954 , 61050 , 66109 , 75770 , 80164 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C125136 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/22/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/22/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-06547 | |
04/02/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Amended Judgment of Conviction filed 3/16/07. Due Date: 10 days | 07-07267 | |
04/09/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Amended Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on March 16, 2007. | 07-07912 | |
04/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. | 07-09240 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Minute order from Clark Co. Clerk appointing Christopher Oram as counsel for appellant. | 07-11200 | |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 07-11201 | |
09/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 18, 2007. | 07-20780 | |
10/19/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-23062 | |
11/01/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have until November 19, 2007, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we direct the clerk to file the untimely docketing statement and transcript request form. | 07-24029 | |
11/01/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14163 | |
11/01/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/08/07 and 03/07/07. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 07-14164 | |
11/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 07-25298 | |
11/21/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 1/8/07 and 3/7/07. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 07-25472 | |
02/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Response due from Oram: 20 days. | 08-03195 | |
02/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to Court Regarding Order Dated February 8, 2008. | 08-05132 | |
03/27/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal. We deny the motion to dismiss this appeal. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. | 08-07573 | |
04/28/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to Court Regarding Order Dated March 27, 2008. | 08-10442 | |
05/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-11370 | |
05/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |