Case: 01-89-00415-CV
01-89-00415-CV
05/01/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Mrs. Ivy Flint
Shirley Mickelsen (Formerly Shirley Mounce)
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
01/04/1990 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
12/16/1989 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
12/01/1989 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
11/16/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/16/1989 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/31/1989 | Submitted | | |
10/31/1989 | Submission | | |
10/31/1989 | Submitted | | |
09/06/1989 | Submission | | |
06/26/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
06/26/1989 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/30/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
05/30/1989 | Filing fee paid | | |
05/01/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
05/01/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/12/1989 | Appeal bond filed | | |
02/10/1989 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
01/13/1989 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/04/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellant | Rodney Merwin |
State | Appellee | James Boanerges |
Trial Court Information
125th District Court
Harris
83-25554