judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00262-CR
04-81-00262-CR
02/08/1982
Assault or Attempted Murder
Gutierrez, Pablo Rangel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/15/1985Mandate Issued
07/15/1985Mandate Issued
07/12/1985Case Returned from Higher Court
06/12/1985Higher Court DecisionRefused
12/20/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/12/1984Petition for Review Filed
11/28/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/01/1984Appeal Reinstated
06/01/1984Appeal Reinstated
06/01/1984Submission
06/01/1984Submitted
05/29/1984Record Filed
12/05/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAbated
05/25/1983Opinion issuedAbated
06/23/1982Submission
04/22/1982Case ready to be set
04/22/1982Brief Filed
04/22/1982Case ready to be set
04/05/1982Brief Filed
03/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/08/1982Record Filed
02/08/1982Record Approved
02/08/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-1814
2 Years + $1,000.00 fine