Case: 02-22-00012-CV
02-22-00012-CV
01/11/2022
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jim Coker
RCI Dining Services, LLC, WKC, Inc., and RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/03/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
03/03/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
03/02/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/11/2022 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
02/11/2022 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
01/25/2022 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||||
01/11/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/03/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
RCI Hospitality Holdings, Inc. | Appellee | Brian S. Rawson |
WKC, Inc. | Appellee | Tyler G. Stuart |
RCI Dining Services, LLC | Appellee | Roy B McKay Tyler G. Stuart Brian S. Rawson |
Coker, Jim | Appellant | Jim Coker |
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Melody Wilkinson
017-306423-19
Court Reporter, 17th District Court