Case Information: 33407 | |||
Short Caption: | TRUONG (VINH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139326 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/30/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/30/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 98-00199 | |
11/30/1998 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 09/17/98 Proceedings. Court Reporter: Arlene Blazi. | 98-00200 | |
11/30/1998 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. 10/29/98 proceedings. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. | 98-00201 | |
12/11/1998 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. District court clerk shall file order of appointment in this court, serve counsel with this order, and submit proof of service to this court, OR file order of non-indigency in this court within 30 days; counsel shall enter appearance 10 days from date of appointment OR appellant shall have 30 days from date of determination to secure counsel if not indigent. Counsel shall file docketing statement within 20 days of first appearance in this court and file opening brief within 120 days. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 98-00352 | |
12/18/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00428 | |
12/23/1998 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 98-00494 | |
12/31/1998 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 09/17/98 and 10/29/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporters: Alrene Blazi and Shirlee Prawalsky. | 98-00589 | |
02/09/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. | 99-00899 | |
02/09/1999 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Mailed on: express mail-no postmark. | 99-00900 | |
03/08/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. | 99-01601 | |
01/26/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-01269 | |
02/23/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-02834 | |
02/23/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/27/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. | 00-02834 |