judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHYLLIS A. DRURY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0250)
Case Number:S-07-0250Case Docketed On:10/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:PHYLLIS A. DRURY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PHYLLIS A. DRURY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPhyllis A. DruryDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
John Derek King
Jonathon Isaac Aimone
Grant Curry
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 130
Citation:194 P.3d 1017

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/31/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client - Jonathon I. AimoneNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client - Grant CurryNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
03/05/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, jury instructions & verdict; Volume IV, transcripts; Volume V, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin, Grant Curry and Jon Aimone, Student Interns for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel, Jonathon I. Aimone, Student Intern, and Grant Curry, Student Intern, argument by Messrs. Curry and Aimone for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/10/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/17/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal