Case: 01-21-00408-CR
01-21-00408-CR
07/28/2021
Sexual Assault
David Gutierrez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/29/2021 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
07/28/2021 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
07/28/2021 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
07/20/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/02/2021 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/31/2021 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gutierrez, David | Criminal - Appellant | Mandy Goldman Miller |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Daniel C. McCrory The Honorable Kim K Ogg |
Trial Court Information
174th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 174th District Court
1573674
Court Reporter 174th District Court