Case: 21-0898
21-0898
10/14/2021
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS
DENNIS SHOOK, AND WIFE JANET SHOOK
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/17/2022 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dennis Shook, et ux. | |||||
10/14/2021 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Harris County. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/30/2022 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
05/27/2022 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
02/17/2022 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dennis Shook, et ux. | ||||||
01/04/2022 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Response is due February 17, 2022. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
01/03/2022 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dennis and Janet Shook. | ||||||
01/03/2022 | Notice of Appearance | Notice of Appearance filed on behalf of Dennis and Janet Shook. | ||||||
12/17/2021 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 18, 2022. |
| |||||
11/16/2021 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
10/14/2021 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Harris County. |
| |||||
10/14/2021 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
10/14/2021 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/30/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Siemens Industry, Inc. | Other interested party | Mr. David B. Weinstein Mr. Thad Kingston Jenks |
BP Equipment Company | Other interested party | Mr. Maulik Shah Mr. James Michael Thompson |
Magnetic Automation Corp. | Other interested party | Mr. Paul Gregory Laughlin Mr. Randy L. Fairless |
Dennis Shook, and wife Janet Shook | Respondent | Mr. Scott A. Cummings Mr. Alton C. Todd Mr. Jerry D. Bullard Mr. Seth Mitchell Park |
Harris County, Texas | Petitioner | Mr. Christian Menefee Cheryl Nikki Elliott Mr. Jonathan G.C. Fombonne Mr. Seth B. Hopkins |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-19-00656-CV
Aff/Pt and Rev & Ren/Pt
634 SW3d 942, 08-31-21
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Amparo Monique Guerra
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Jeffrey A. Shadwick
2016-54211