judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00016-CR
09-82-00016-CR
02/05/1982
Theft
Brown, Carey Tyrone
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/1983Case stored
03/21/1983Mandate Issued
02/23/1983Petition for ReviewRefused
11/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1982Brief Filed
03/08/1982Brief Filed
02/05/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
317th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Olen Underwood
37,860
8 years TDC