Case: 14-21-00401-CV
14-21-00401-CV
07/20/2021
Contract
Muzaffar Hassan Siddiqi and Zahida Siddiqi
Toorak Capital Partners, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/30/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||
07/30/2021 | Court fee due | | |||
07/20/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/20/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/20/2021 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||
07/19/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
07/06/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/04/2021 | Status | Docketing statement due |
09/06/2021 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Muzaffar Hassan Siddiqi and Zahida Siddiqi | Appellant | Robert C. Vilt |
Toorak Capital Partners, LLC | Appellee | Robert Hakari |
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
20-DCV-277120
Elizabeth Wittu