judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00101-CR
14-82-00101-CR
02/05/1982
All Misdemeanors
Rivera, Leo Vega
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/31/1983Mandate Issued
08/31/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/23/1983No description available.
06/02/1983Submission
05/02/1983Case ready to be set
10/12/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/09/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
07/15/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
02/05/1982Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 7
Harris
633,078
$150 & 20 days