judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-81-00186-CR
12-81-00186-CR
02/09/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Collins, Evelyn
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/22/1984
03/15/1984Mandate Issued
01/12/1984Opinion issuedNo Description Available.
06/23/1983Submitted
06/23/1982Brief Filed
05/24/1982Brief Filed
04/29/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/22/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/10/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/09/1982No Description Available.
02/09/1982
02/05/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/19/1982
05/11/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1984Case StoredCase stored
03/22/1984RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
173rd District Court
Henderson
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
A-1993
25 yrs. TDC