judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00057-CR
04-82-00057-CR
02/09/1982
Theft
Earls, Arthur Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/09/1983Mandate Issued
05/09/1983Mandate Issued
03/11/1983No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/11/1983Motion to Withdraw DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1983No Description Available.
03/10/1983Appeal Reinstated
02/18/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
02/02/1983Opinion issuedAbated
02/02/1983Submission
02/02/1983Opinion issuedAbated
02/02/1983Submission
02/02/1983Submitted
02/09/1982Record Filed
02/09/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/01/1980Case ready to be set
09/01/1980Waives Oral Argument
09/01/1980Case ready to be set
04/08/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
175th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Richard Woods
76-CR-2333
2 to 4 years