judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STUDLEY (KEVIN) VS. STATE, WELFARE

Case Information: 33406
Short Caption:STUDLEY (KEVIN) VS. STATE, WELFARECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI98206Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/02/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
11/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00196
01/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00542
02/02/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 2/1/99. 99-00717
02/02/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to either pay the filing fee or demonstrate that he may proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this appeal. 99-05342
07/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Since it appears that appellant has not sought leave of the district court to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, we defer ruling on his motion at this time. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to demonstrate to this court that the district court has either granted or denied his request for in forma pauperis status pursuant to NRAP 24(a). Failure to comply with this order may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal. 99-06913
09/23/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to comply with or otherwise respond to our order. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[In light of this order, we deny appellant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-09089
10/19/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-10135
10/19/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 20, 1999. 99-10135