judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNNIE L. HUTCHINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0249)
Case Number:S-07-0249Case Docketed On:10/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Lander Fremont CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:JOHNNIE L. HUTCHINGS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHNNIE L. HUTCHINGS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJohnnie L. Hutchings Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingRobert Allen Bundy
Bruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/29/2007Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
10/29/2007Service - Other - sent copy of petition to attorney general's office this date.ServiceOtherFinal
10/30/2007Motion - Injunctive relief - Motion for interlocutory injunctionMotionInjunctive reliefFinal
10/30/2007Memorandum - In support of motion for interlocutory injunctionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
10/30/2007Affidavit - Other - Affidavit of Johnnie L. HutchingsAffidavitOtherFinal
10/30/2007Motion - Expedite - Motion to expedite ruling order on motion for interlocutory injunction.MotionBrief onlyFinal
11/01/2007Motion - Expedite - Second Motion to expedite ruling order on motion for interlocutory injunctionMotionBrief onlyFinal
11/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - "Notice Defendant/Appellant Ends Appeal Complaint in this court due to Court's Failure Secure/Protect Defendant/Appellant's U.S. Constitutional Right to Appeal."Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/16/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal