judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00142-CR
05-82-00142-CR
02/09/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Alfred Ray Bonds
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
11/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/03/1984Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Denied
10/28/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
10/19/1983Letter issued by the court
10/05/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
09/26/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/02/1983Set for submission on oral argument
08/03/1983Motion for rehearing filed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/20/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/20/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/25/1982Reporters record filed
06/25/1982Clerks record filed
05/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/09/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Bonds, Alfred RayCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 292nd District Court
F81-31623-MV
22 years TDC