Case: 11-22-00085-CV
11-22-00085-CV
04/05/2022
Divorce
George Francis Sheehan, Jr.
Pamela Sheehan
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/12/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
09/12/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/2023 | Case stored | | |||||||
11/06/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/24/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
08/03/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/12/2023 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
05/15/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||||
10/13/2022 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
10/12/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
09/19/2022 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
09/12/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
08/11/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
08/05/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
07/15/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/05/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
04/07/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||||
04/07/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
04/04/2022 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
04/04/2022 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
04/01/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court |
| |||||||
03/17/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge |
| |||||||
01/19/2022 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/06/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/06/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sheehan, Pamela | Appellee | Mark D. Threadgill Stuart Starry |
Sheehan, George | Appellant | Kevin B. Miller Matthew J. Olivarez |
Trial Court Information
318th District Court
Midland
Honorable David W. Lindemood, Judge
FM67035
Danielle Bell Hinesly, Court Reporter