Case: 11-88-00240-CR
11-88-00240-CR
11/18/1988
Writ of Mandamus
Bates, Jr., Milburn Wayne
Hon. Donald H. Lane, Judge
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/22/1988 | Mot. - On writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/22/1988 | Mot. - On writ of mandamus disposed | | |
12/16/1988 | Mot. - For leave to file Pet. for writ of mandamus | | |
11/23/1988 | Mot. - On writ of mandamus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/18/1988 | Mot. - For leave to file Pet. for writ of mandamus | | |
11/18/1988 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/23/1989 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bates, Jr., Milburn Wayne | Criminal - Appellant | |
Hon. Donald H. Lane, Judge | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Alfred G. Leal
12,135-A