judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHELLEY SUE WILLIAMS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0232)
Case Number:S-07-0232Case Docketed On:10/08/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:SHELLEY SUE WILLIAMS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHELLEY SUE WILLIAMS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShelley Sue WilliamsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/27/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/27/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/31/2007Motion - Remand to district court and stay briefing scheduleMotionRemand to district courtFinal
01/02/2008Service - Other - amended certificate on appellant's combined motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel and for stay of briefing scheduleServiceOtherFinal
01/02/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/03/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/23/2008Order - Remand - CaleneOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
03/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal and waiver of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/06/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/07/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal